+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee return to Rules Committee
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor