+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2018: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor