+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor