+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor