+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (9)
March 14, 2013: Senate/ substituted
March 14, 2013: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 14, 2013: Senate/ motion to reconsider
March 14, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 14, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 14, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
March 11, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 11, 2013: House/ substituted
March 6, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor