+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed