+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 21, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 24, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor