+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ lifted from Rules Comm
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ read 1st & 2nd (Under Suspension)
- House/ lift bill from committee
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 4
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor