+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (3)
February 1, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2012: House/ circled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor