+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ filed
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 4
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2019: House/ circled
March 5, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
March 5, 2019: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 4
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor