+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ amended/ placed on Consent
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment # 2
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 3
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
March 11, 2009: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 11, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 18
- Absent: 11
March 10, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
February 27, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 23, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor