+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
February 15, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Absent: 11
February 9, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor