+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 61
- Absent: 14
February 29, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor