+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 3, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 14, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 17, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
February 7, 2011: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 4, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 3, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 28, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor