+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On December 18, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 2
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 8, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 2, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
January 25, 2016: House/ circled
January 25, 2016: House/ floor amendment # 2
January 25, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
January 25, 2016: House/ uncircled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor