+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 19, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 13, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (8)
February 9, 2012: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 8, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 2, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2012: House/ uncircled
January 30, 2012: House/ substituted
January 30, 2012: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2012: House/ circled
January 24, 2012: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor