+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substitute
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 29
February 23, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor