+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ to House
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: House/ floor amendment # 2
March 7, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 29, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor