+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor