+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2017: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 12
March 2, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
March 2, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor