+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House/ 2nd reading
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 13, 2014: Senate/ circled
March 13, 2014: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2014: Senate/ substituted
March 13, 2014: Senate/ uncircled
March 13, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor