+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (8)
March 4, 2021: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2021: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2021: House/ uncircled
February 26, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2021: House/ circled
February 23, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 3