+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 28, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 3
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ to Senate
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 23, 2019 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
Senate Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (12)
March 6, 2020: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 7
March 5, 2020: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2020: Senate/ uncircled
March 5, 2020: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
March 2, 2020: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 3
March 2, 2020: Senate/ circled
February 19, 2020: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 12, 2020: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 12, 2020: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2020: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 5
January 31, 2020: House/ floor amendment # 1
January 29, 2020: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor