+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
March 6, 2014: House/ substituted
February 25, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor