+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ returned to Rules
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2016: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor