+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2013: Senate/ circled
March 13, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 13, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
March 7, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor