+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ substituted/placed on Consent
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ placed on Consent Cal
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2008: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 29, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2008: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Absent: 11
February 18, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor