+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 3
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 14, 2019: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
March 13, 2019: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2019: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
March 8, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2019: House/ floor amendment # 3
March 4, 2019: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor