+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
March 4, 2013: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor