+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 15, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 20, 2010 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 15, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 17, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (4)
February 10, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2011: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 10
February 1, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
January 26, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor