+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
February 23, 2021: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 22, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2021: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2021: House/ uncircled
February 3, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 3, 2021: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
January 19, 2021: House/ circled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor