+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ lifted from Rules Comm
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 12, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor