+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ lifted from Rules
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ held for reconsideration
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor