+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 15, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor