+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
February 29, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 25, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
February 22, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor