+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 75
March 6, 2017: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 4
February 27, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor