+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 12, 2015: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 5
March 11, 2015: Senate/ uncircled
March 11, 2015: Senate/ circled
March 11, 2015: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
March 11, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4
March 6, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
March 2, 2015: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor