+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2019: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2019: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 11
February 26, 2019: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor