+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 21, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 3, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 26, 2021: Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2021: House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor