+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 13, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 10
February 22, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 7
February 9, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor