+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd (Suspension)
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Held
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 2009: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 4
March 10, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 5
February 26, 2009: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor