+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ to Senate
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2018: House/ floor amendment
February 22, 2018: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 22, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 22, 2018: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 15, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor