+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ lifted from Rules Comm
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 7, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 11
March 2, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 24, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor