+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ substituted by Rules
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ held for reconsideration
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Vote
February 25, 2011: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor