+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2013: House/ circled
March 1, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor