+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2015: Senate/ circled
March 12, 2015: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
March 12, 2015: Senate/ uncircled
March 6, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor