+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
On January 28, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered by Short Title
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor