+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 23, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor