+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance
+ − Vote
February 26, 2010: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor