+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ intent language
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 22, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 21, 2005 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
February 2, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 24, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor